Learn Speed Math Tricks
Learn Speed Math Now

Check it Out for Yourself 
92×95=?
(10092)8+(10095)5
8+5=13(10013)87
8×5=40
92×95=8740
I love homeschooling my children so much that when I come across something like this it is like Christmas morning. I get so excited I have to learn more so I can teach them an easier way to do things which makes them want to learn more!! Win, Win!
Want more Math Tricks?
Want to square a number that ends in 5?
35×35=?
Do the trick I learned from Vedics Math.
The tens spot add one to the top than multiply the two together 3 turns to 4 than multiply 4×3=12
Than just multiply the ones spot.
5×5=25
35×35=1225
Math Trick For multiplying 11
I taught my children the trick for 11 when they were 6 and 7.They are 10 and 12 now.
11×54=?
5 in front leave a space then put 4 in back at two together to get middle number.
11×54= 594
11×78=?
Little tricky
7_8 to get middle # at 7+8=15
Do not put 15 in middle
only one # fits and that is the 5
(7+1)858
11×78=858
Remember to carry the # from the tens spot to the hundreds spot.
What about bigger #’s?
11×1324=?
Put the 1 in front the 4 in back and for the middle #’s just add from left to right.
1(1+3)4(3+2)5(2+4)6 4
11×1324=14564
Remember if one of your #’s is more than 9 just carry to the number in front.
11×1823=?
1(1+8)9(8+2)10(2+3)5 3
1(9+1)10 053
(1+1)20053
11×1823=20053
Getting tired so I will stop for now but will be back again soon with more speed math tricks.
Peace and Love
Donel Rourke
Want to be able to share your tips and tricks for the world to see.
All you have to do isclick now and start sharing.
The reason I didn’t share earlier is because I didn’t have the knowledge how.
See what I have learned that will take homeschooling to another level
Like this:
Like Loading...
Related
wow I bet the kids really think this is fun, will truly blow peoples mind with at how fast they can do complicated math. Proud you never stop looking and learning